NH HB541 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB541

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-08 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 11-5)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to allocating electoral college electors based on the national popular vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to allocating electoral college electors based on the national popular vote.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-08HouseInterim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 11-5)
2020-08-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/10/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99566391883 - Executive Session to Follow
2020-01-08HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 37
2019-11-08HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 6
2019-10-04HouseExecutive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-10-04HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2019-02-13HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-06House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 19

Same As/Similar To

HB541 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback