NH HB540 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a credit against business profits taxes for motion picture production expenditures in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a credit against business profits taxes for motion picture production expenditures in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar) |
2013-10-24 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/13/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-09-10 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-07-02 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-06-18 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/25/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG.199 |