NH HB536 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2118h (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to death benefits for public works employees killed in the line of duty, and relative to workers' compensation offsets for certain retirement system benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to death benefits for public works employees killed in the line of duty, and relative to workers' compensation offsets for certain retirement system benefits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2118h (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar)
2021-10-06HouseExecutive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2021-09-15HouseDivision I Work Session: 09/28/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212
2021-08-31HouseDivision I Work Session: 09/14/2021 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 212
2021-03-30HouseRetained in Committee
2021-03-25HouseExecutive Session: 03/29/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660
2021-03-04HouseDivision I Work Session: 03/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94444579237
2021-02-24HouseReferred to Finance 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 9
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 9
2021-02-17HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 6
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 01/27/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/92995497899 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 52

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback