NH HB536 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2523h for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 5-6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2523h for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 5-6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment for special education services for chartered public school students and relative to federal funds for chartered public schools.
Title
Relative to payment for special education services for chartered public school students and relative to federal funds for chartered public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2523h for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 5-6 |
2015-09-24 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-09-23 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/1/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-09-23 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/1/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-09-09 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/22/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-05-27 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-04-22 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/30/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 228 |