NH HB536 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Senate Sen. Forsythe Moved Laid On Table, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 12, Pg.468
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the natural right to carry a firearm, openly or concealed, without a license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the natural right to carry a firearm, openly or concealed, without a license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1891s (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-05 - House - OTP/AM 2679H (Y: 193 N: 122 NV: 50 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-02 Senate Sen. Forsythe Moved Laid On Table, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 12, Pg.468
2012-05-02 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment Not Voted On
2012-05-02 Senate Committee Amendment 1891s, New Title, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 12, Pg.468
2012-04-27 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1891s, New Title, 5/2/12; Senate Calendar 17A
2012-01-19 Senate Hearing: 1/26/12, Room 100, State House, 2:00 p.m; Senate Calendar 4
2012-01-12 Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2, Pg.19
2012-01-05 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2679h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-122; House Journal 8, PG.466-469
2012-01-05 House Amendment #2679h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 8, PG.466-467
2011-10-25 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2679h; House Calendar 69, PG.2154-2155
2011-10-25 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2679h for Jan 4 (Vote 12-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2216
2011-09-28 House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/20/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2011-09-28 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/5/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2011-09-13 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2011-03-09 House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.823
2011-03-02 House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2011-02-16 House Public Hearing: 3/3/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2011-02-09 House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2011-02-09 House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2011-01-24 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 11, PG. 190

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback