NH HB536 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-25 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2679h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the natural right to carry a firearm, openly or concealed, without a license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the natural right to carry a firearm, openly or concealed, without a license.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-25 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2679h
2011-10-25 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2679h for Jan 4 (Vote 12-5; Regular Calendar)
2011-09-28 House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/20/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2011-09-28 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/5/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2011-09-13 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2011-03-09 House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.823
2011-03-02 House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2011-02-16 House Public Hearing: 3/3/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2011-02-09 House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2011-02-09 House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2011-01-24 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 11, PG. 190

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback