NH HB535 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/05/2016; Chapter 58; Eff. 7/4/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/05/2016; Chapter 58; Eff. 7/4/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to signs advising motorists approaching highway emergencies.
Title
Relative to signs advising motorists approaching highway emergencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Byron [R] | Rep. Daniel Hansberry [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] |
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 05/05/2016; Chapter 58; Eff. 7/4/2016 |
2016-04-28 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 53 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/28/2016); Senate Journal 16 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/14/2016; Senate Journal 13 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/14/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-01-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2547h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 49 |
2016-01-06 | House | Amendment #2015-2547h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 49 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2547h for Jan 6 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 11 |
2015-10-20 | House | Continued Executive Session: 11/4/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-10-14 | House | Executive Session: 10/20/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203==RECESSED== |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-09-21 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/29/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-02-18 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG. 228 |