NH HB535 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 05/09/2011; Chapter 0054
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 05/09/2011; Chapter 0054
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the committee to study parole boards and parole board procedures.
Title
Relative to the committee to study parole boards and parole board procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | House Signed by Governor 05/09/2011; Effective 05/09/2011; Chapter 0054 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 15, Pg.293 | |
2011-04-27 | House Enrolled; House Journal 40, PG.1386 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 12, Pg.255 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.250 | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Hearing: 3/24/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-02 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.672 | |
2011-02-22 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 2 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.386 | |
2011-02-16 | House Executive Session: 2/22/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 11, PG. 190 |