NH HB533 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 190; Eff: 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 190; Eff: 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a division of investigation and compliance in the lottery commission.
Title
Establishing a division of investigation and compliance in the lottery commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 190; Eff: 01/01/2022 |
2021-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2021-1978c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2021-1978c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2021-1978c; 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-15 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/15/2021 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Giuda, French, D'Allesandro; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1200s and Requests CofC (Reps. Major, McGuire, Abrami, Ames): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 52 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1200s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1200s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1200s, 05/06/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/12/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0906h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 26 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0906h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 26 |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0906h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 14 |
2021-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2021 10:45 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/94033090497 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 21 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 21 |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 15 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92120368845 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 52 |