NH HB522 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 260; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study the environmental and health effects of evolving 5G technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study the environmental and health effects of evolving 5G technology.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 260; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/19/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2461e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 46
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2461e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24A
2019-04-11SenateHearing: 04/16/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 18
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 37
2019-03-07HouseSpecial Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 19
2019-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback