NH HB522 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 141; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 141; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making certain changes in the law governing toxic substances in the workplace to comply with federal law.
Title
Making certain changes in the law governing toxic substances in the workplace to comply with federal law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 141; Effective Date 1/1/2016 |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1782 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/21/2015); Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1637EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1781 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1637e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 4/7/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 797 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 405 |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG. 228 |