NH HB521 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 521-FN 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; )
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the chartered public school annual grant for leased space.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the chartered public school annual grant for leased space.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-29HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 521-FN 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; )
2021-10-06HouseExecutive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2021-09-13HouseDivision II Work Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2021-03-23HouseRetained in Committee
2021-02-16HousePublic Hearing: 02/16/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-02-16HouseExecutive Session: 02/16/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660
2021-02-09HouseVacated and Referred to Finance (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 01/06/2021 House Journal 2 P. 58
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 52

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback