NH HB521 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB521
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the alimony statute.
Title
Revising the alimony statute.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 28 |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 11/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-09-19 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-06-07 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-05-17 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 06/06/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-05-03 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2017 Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 17 |
Same As/Similar To
HB521 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)