NH HB521 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Rereferred to Committee, Div. 11Y-9N, Motion Adopted, Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Rereferred to Committee, Div. 11Y-9N, Motion Adopted, Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the size of the pool of the workers' compensation appeals board.
Title
Relative to the size of the pool of the workers' compensation appeals board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Div. 11Y-9N, Motion Adopted, Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/28/15; Senate Calendar 23 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1609s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1609s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1609s, 5/14/15; Senate Calendar 21 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing: 4/2/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0698h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 796-797 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0698h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 796-797 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0698h for Mar 11 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 405 |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG. 228 |