NH HB515 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to evaluate the cost-effectiveness of toll collection on the New Hampshire turnpike system.
Title
Establishing a commission to evaluate the cost-effectiveness of toll collection on the New Hampshire turnpike system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 59 |
2019-03-07 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Abramson): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 59 |
2019-02-28 | House | Special Order to 03/07/2019 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 62 |
2019-02-14 | House | Special Order to 2/27/2019 Without Objection House Journal 5 P. 77 |
2019-02-14 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Abramson) 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 5 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 10 |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 3 P. 18 |