NH HB515 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to oversight of guardians ad litem by the guardian ad litem board.
Title
Relative to oversight of guardians ad litem by the guardian ad litem board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 53 |
2015-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 13 |
2015-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 9/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-08-24 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/16/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-05-27 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-05-05 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/12/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-03-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 3/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-02-18 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG. 227 |