NH HB515 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to oversight of guardians ad litem by the guardian ad litem board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to oversight of guardians ad litem by the guardian ad litem board.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2015-11-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 13
2015-09-16HouseExecutive Session: 9/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
2015-08-24HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/16/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
2015-05-27HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2015-05-05HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/12/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2015-03-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 3/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
2015-02-18HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 2/17/2015 Legislative Office Building 206
2015-02-04HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG. 227

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback