NH HB515 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to voter registration and relative to procedures for absentee voting.
Title
Relative to voter registration and relative to procedures for absentee voting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.382 | |
2011-11-02 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2203 | |
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/27/2011 Legislative Office Building 308 1:00 PM or Immediately Following Public Hearing | |
2011-09-20 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/28/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 8:30 Amendment)== | |
2011-09-20 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/27/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-09-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/21/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2011-09-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/20/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2011-05-10 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/17/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-02-22 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.823 | |
2011-02-08 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 11, PG. 189 |