NH HB514 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Lay HB514 on Table (Rep. Wilhelm): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-175 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Lay HB514 on Table (Rep. Wilhelm): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-175 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the dissemination of obscene material by schools and institutions of higher learning.
Title
Relative to the dissemination of obscene material by schools and institutions of higher learning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - Table (Y: 200 N: 175 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Table (Y: 200 N: 175 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Table (Y: 200 N: 175 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Lay HB514 on Table (Rep. Wilhelm): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-175 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 41 |
2023-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/16/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 13 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 19 |