NH HB513 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 234-99; House Journal 28, PG.883-885
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 234-99; House Journal 28, PG.883-885
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to end of life aid in dying for certain persons suffering from a terminal disease.
Title
Relative to end of life aid in dying for certain persons suffering from a terminal disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - ITL (Y: 234 N: 99 NV: 65 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 234-99; House Journal 28, PG.883-885 | |
2011-03-09 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 22, PG.558 | |
2011-03-09 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 15-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.558 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-23 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 (If Necessary Continued 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208) | |
2011-02-16 | House Public Hearing: 2/28/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-09 | House Vacated from Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 16, PG.308 | |
2011-02-02 | House ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 189 |