NH HB512 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB512
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to develop a memorandum of understanding between the department of transportation and the department of resources and economic development for staffing, operating, and maintaining the state's rest areas and welcome centers.
Title
Establishing a commission to develop a memorandum of understanding between the department of transportation and the department of resources and economic development for staffing, operating, and maintaining the state's rest areas and welcome centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-21 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar) |
2017-09-21 | House | Executive Session: 09/21/2017 Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-09-13 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-05-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-02-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing: 02/14/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-02-02 | House | Vacated and Referred to Public Works and Highways (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 2 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB512 (Carry Over) 2017-09-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar)