NH HB512 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Veto Sustained 06/16/2016: Regular Calendar 169-130 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Veto Sustained 06/16/2016: Regular Calendar 169-130 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting confiscation of firearms, ammunition, or firearms accessories during a state of emergency.
Title
Prohibiting confiscation of firearms, ammunition, or firearms accessories during a state of emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Shari LeBreche [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] |
Rep. Deborah Wheeler [D] | Rep. John Balcom [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. Brian Gallagher [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Veto Override (Y: 169 N: 130 NV: 60 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 231 N: 121 NV: 21 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 231 N: 121 NV: 21 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | House | Veto Sustained 06/16/2016: Regular Calendar 169-130 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote |
2016-06-13 | House | Vetoed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-07 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 61 |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2045e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 58 |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2045e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1785s (Rep. Tholl): Motion Adopted DV 154-115 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 20 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1785s, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Reconsider HB 512: Vote on Ought to Pass as Amended, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1785s, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1785s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2016 Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1785s, 05/12/2016; Senate Calendar 18 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Special Order HB 512 to 05/12/2016, Without Objection, Motion Adopted Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1785s, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Hearing: 03/14/2016, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-01-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2379h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 231-121 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 79 |
2016-01-26 | House | Amendment #2015-2379h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 79 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2379h for Jan 6 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 15 |
2015-10-07 | House | Executive Session: 10/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-09-08 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/16/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-08-24 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-08-04 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-03-04 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 227 |