NH HB512 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.811
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.811
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the power of a peace officer to make an arrest without a warrant.
Title
Relative to the power of a peace officer to make an arrest without a warrant.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.811 |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 18-2; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.522-523 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.198 |