NH HB512 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to education requirements for certification as a guardian ad litem.
Title
Relative to education requirements for certification as a guardian ad litem.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.694 | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.522 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/2/2011 Legislative Office Building 206 Following House Session | |
2011-02-16 | House Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/16/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 11, PG. 189 |