NH HB511 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 166; Sec. 3 eff 11/01/18 Rem eff 06/28/17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study environmentally-triggered chronic illness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study environmentally-triggered chronic illness.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 166; Sec. 3 eff 11/01/18 Rem eff 06/28/17
2017-06-13HouseEnrolled 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9
2017-06-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-01HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1462s and 1547s (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 3
2017-04-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2017-1462s and 2017-1547s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15
2017-04-27SenateSen. Soucy Floor Amendment #2017-1547s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15
2017-04-27SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1462s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15
2017-04-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1462s, 04/27/2017; Senate Calendar 20
2017-04-13SenateHearing: 04/18/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 19
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0554h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 34
2017-03-08HouseAmendment #2017-0554h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 34
2017-03-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0554h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-02-27House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/28/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-02-22House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/01/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-02-01HousePublic Hearing: 02/08/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback