NH HB511 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - House Signed By Governor 06/28/2011; Effective 08/27/2011; Chapter 0221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - House Signed By Governor 06/28/2011; Effective 08/27/2011; Chapter 0221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to retired judges over 70 years of age.
Title
Relative to retired judges over 70 years of age.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | House Signed By Governor 06/28/2011; Effective 08/27/2011; Chapter 0221 | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1728 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2217s (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1715 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 19, Pg.539 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2217s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 19, Pg.519 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Committee Amendment 2217s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.519 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-2217s, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/31/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-02 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.674 | |
2011-02-22 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 2 (Vote 11-3; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.388 | |
2011-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/15/2011 Legislative Office Building 208 Following House Session | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 189 |