NH HB509 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB509
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 8-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 8-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the university system to disclose annual expenditures in its operating budget.
Title
Requiring the university system to disclose annual expenditures in its operating budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Dean-Bailey [R] | Rep. Ryan Smith [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] |
Rep. Steven Beaudoin [R] | Rep. Nick Zaricki [R] | Rep. Caleb Dyer [L] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-31 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 8-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 10/24/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-09-19 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2017 Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 11:40 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB509 (Carry Over) 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 8-0; Consent Calendar)