NH HB508 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the definition of "temporary" as it pertains to residence in the state for voting purposes.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the definition of "temporary" as it pertains to residence in the state for voting purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 12 |
2021-03-29 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 9 |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/08/2021 10:00 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91394352757Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 51 |