NH HB506 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Hearing: Feb 19 @ 10:30 am in Legislative Office Building 306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing state holidays for elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing state holidays for elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/07/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback