NH HB506 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - II. Remainder Effective 06/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - II. Remainder Effective 06/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain time periods for adoption and amendment of town codes and ordinances, permitting the town of Derry to combine the positions of tax collector and treasurer, and dissolving the police commission for the town of Hooksett.
Title
Relative to certain time periods for adoption and amendment of town codes and ordinances, permitting the town of Derry to combine the positions of tax collector and treasurer, and dissolving the police commission for the town of Hooksett.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | House | II. Remainder Effective 06/06/2013 |
2013-06-13 | House | I. Section I Effective 08/05/2013 |
2013-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor 06/06/2013; Chapter 0070 |
2013-05-30 | House | Enrolled, 5/29/13; House Journal 45, PG.1527 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-29 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1519s(NT) and #1849s(NT) (Rep Porter): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 45, PG.1510 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Without Objection, the Chair ordered HB 506 to 3rdg and Final Passage in the Early Session; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1519s, New Title, 1849s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Floor Amendment #2013-1849s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1519s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 506 is Special Ordered, 2/3 Necessary; Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Moved to Remove HB 506 from the Consent Calendar |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1519s, New Title, 5/23/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | On 5/1/2013 at 9:00 a.m., a hearing on proposed non-germane amendment #2013-1352s to HB 506 which was previously heard on April 10th, Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 4/10/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:50 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.766 |
2013-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 13 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.510 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.198 |