NH HB504 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 221-157 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 221-157 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to election-related amendments to the United States Constitution.
Title
Relative to election-related amendments to the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Rep. Ivy Vann [D] | Rep. Timothy Smith [D] |
Rep. William Pearson [D] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-18 - House - Veto Override (Y: 221 N: 157 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | House | Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 221-157 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 36 |
2019-07-11 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 06/06/2019; Senate Calendar 25 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Hearing: 05/01/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 200-149 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 52 |
2019-03-07 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Failed DV 161-183 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 52 |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 8-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 15 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 17 |