NH HB504 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to online driver education.
Title
Relative to online driver education.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 27 |
2015-10-20 | House | Executive Session: 11/4/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-10-14 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/13/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-03-03 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG. 226 |