NH HB504 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Signed By Governor 05/31/2011; Effective 07/30/2011; Chapter 0111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Signed By Governor 05/31/2011; Effective 07/30/2011; Chapter 0111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Licensing reverse distributors of drugs and requiring manufacturers, wholesalers, distributors, service distributors, and brokers to report changes in ownership.
Title
Licensing reverse distributors of drugs and requiring manufacturers, wholesalers, distributors, service distributors, and brokers to report changes in ownership.
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Case [R] | Rep. Sandra Keans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | House Signed By Governor 05/31/2011; Effective 07/30/2011; Chapter 0111 | |
2011-05-18 | House Enrolled; House Journal 44, PG.1564 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 18, Pg.364 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 15, Pg.312 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15, Pg.307 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Hearing: 4/21/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 12, Pg.244 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0698h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.704 | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment #0698h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.704 | |
2011-03-09 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0698h (New Title); House Calendar 23, PG.638-639 | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0698h(NT) for Mar 15 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.525 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 3/4/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 189 |