NH HB501 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a minimum pay rate for adjunct faculty of the university system of New Hampshire and community college system of New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a minimum pay rate for adjunct faculty of the university system of New Hampshire and community college system of New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 40
2021-03-29HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 18
2021-03-25HouseExecutive Session: 03/25/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98630616522
2021-03-04House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 03/04/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92992494588 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-02-18HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment # : 03/04/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92992494588 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-02-03House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/11/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98476278055
2021-01-27House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 02/04/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following linkTo join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93123047403 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 51

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback