NH HB501 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 9-10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing municipalities to grant a veterans property tax credit to residents who served not less than one year active duty in the armed forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing municipalities to grant a veterans property tax credit to residents who served not less than one year active duty in the armed forces.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-12HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 9-10
2015-09-16HouseExecutive Session: 10/6/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2015-08-03HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2015-04-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 5/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2015-02-17HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-11HouseContinued Executive Session: 2/17/2015 4:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2015-02-10HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2015-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 2/10/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 ==RECESSED==
2015-02-04HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/10/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2015-01-29House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 9:10 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2015-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:40 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 226

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback