NH HB501 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED ===;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED ===;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Instituting a state minimum hourly rate.
Title
Instituting a state minimum hourly rate.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Kenneth Ward [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. Charles Weed [D] |
Rep. Peter Sullivan [D] | Rep. Larry Phillips [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - OTP/AM 0658H(NT) (Y: 200 N: 133 NV: 10 Abs: 54) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - FLAM 0824H (REP WEED) (Y: 152 N: 182 NV: 10 Abs: 53) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - OTP/AM 0658H(NT) (Y: 200 N: 133 NV: 10 Abs: 54) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - FLAM 0824H (REP WEED) (Y: 152 N: 182 NV: 10 Abs: 53) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED ===; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: === ROOM CHANGE === 4/9/13, Room 100, State House, 2:20 p.m. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 4/9/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0658h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-133; House Journal 26, PG.821-826 |
2013-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment #2013-0824h (Rep Weed): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 152-182; House Journal 26, PG.822-824 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0658h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.821-822 |
2013-03-06 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.525 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-0658h (New Title); House Calendar 22, PG.551 |
2013-03-06 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0658h(NT) for Mar 13 (Vote 15-5; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.525 |
2013-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-02-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/26/2013 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG.197 |