NH HB501 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.707
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the teaching of cardiopulmonary resuscitation in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the teaching of cardiopulmonary resuscitation in public schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-15 House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.707
2011-03-08 House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.528
2011-02-18 House Executive Session: 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2011-02-09 House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205-207
2011-01-21 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Education; House Journal 11, PG. 188

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback