NH HB500 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/10/2016; Chapter 234; Eff. 6/10/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the prohibition on the use of silencing devices for taking wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the prohibition on the use of silencing devices for taking wildlife.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-17 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - House - OTP (Y: 184 N: 124 NV: 22 Abs: 69) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-20HouseSigned by Governor Hassan 06/10/2016; Chapter 234; Eff. 6/10/2016
2016-06-02HouseEnrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 56
2016-06-02SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20
2016-05-25HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1992e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 27
2016-05-25SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1992e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19
2016-05-11HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 0953s (Rep. Kidder): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 3
2016-03-17SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 0953s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9
2016-03-17SenateCommittee Amendment 0953s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2016 Senate Journal 9
2016-03-17SenateSpecial Order HB 500 to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted Senate Journal 9
2016-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0953s, 03/17/2016; Senate Calendar 10
2016-03-02SenateHearing: 03/09/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9
2016-02-23SenateIntroduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 6
2016-01-27HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-124 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 15
2015-11-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-11-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 6 (Vote 7-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 22-23
2015-09-25HouseExecutive Session: 10/15/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2015-08-04HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2015-06-02HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/30/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-03-04HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-23HouseExecutive Session: 3/3/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2015-02-17HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2015-02-12House===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2015-01-29House===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 12, PG. 226

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback