NH HB500 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the prohibition on the use of silencing devices for taking wildlife.
Title
Repealing the prohibition on the use of silencing devices for taking wildlife.
Sponsors
Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. John Martin [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. Leon Rideout [R] |
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. David Bickford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 6 (Vote 7-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 22-23 |
2015-09-25 | House | Executive Session: 10/15/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-08-04 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-06-02 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/30/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-03-04 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-02-12 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-29 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 12, PG. 226 |