NH HB498 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting the use of firearms by military or veterans groups in the compact part of a town for military or veterans events, or national holidays.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting the use of firearms by military or veterans groups in the compact part of a town for military or veterans events, or national holidays.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2013-11-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2255h for Jan 8 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-02HouseRetained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2013-08-20HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/18/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2013-03-19HouseRetained in Committee
2013-03-14HouseExecutive Session: 3/19/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2013-03-13HouseRecommit (Rep Pantelakos): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.773
2013-03-06HouseSpecial Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; House Journal 24, PG.703
2013-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 6 (Vote 13-6; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.515
2013-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2013-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 2/5/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.197

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback