NH HB497 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Retained in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to payment by the state of a portion of retirement system contributions of political subdivision employers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to payment by the state of a portion of retirement system contributions of political subdivision employers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - OTP (Y: 256 N: 120 NV: 8 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 144 N: 232 NV: 8 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-02-15HouseFinance-Division I Work Session: 02/20/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Finance 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 41
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 256-120 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 36
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0113h (NT): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 144-232 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 36
2019-02-06HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0113h (NT)
2019-02-06HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 15
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback