NH HB496 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 55; Eff: 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to license plate covers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to license plate covers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/25/2021; Chapter 55; Eff: 01/01/2022
2021-05-17SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/13/2021); Senate Journal 16
2021-05-17HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021
2021-04-22SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/22/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-04-08SenateRemote Hearing: 04/13/2021, 02:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2021-04-07SenateIntroduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 11
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0631h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 49
2021-04-07HouseAmendment # 2021-0631h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 49
2021-03-26HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0631h (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 25
2021-03-05HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99182085994
2021-02-03HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98796113084 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 51

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback