NH HB496 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting public employers from using criminal history in employment decisions.
Title
Prohibiting public employers from using criminal history in employment decisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-03-12 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Infantine): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1242 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0150h (NT) |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 431 |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG. 226 |