NH HB496 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0263; Effective Date 1/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0263; Effective Date 1/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to driving privileges for certain first-time DWI offenders.
Title
Relative to driving privileges for certain first-time DWI offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0263; Effective Date 1/1/2016. |
2014-06-18 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/14) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1953c, Adopted Div 310-28 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1953c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1953c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-28 | House | Conferee Change: Rep Fields Replaces Rep Charron |
2014-05-23 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/27/2014; 2:00 PM; Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Boutin, and Soucy; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Cushing, Shurtleff, Charron, Harriott-Gathright |
2014-05-22 | House | Rep. Wallner moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1491s, 1646s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Floor Amendment #2014-1646s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1491s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1491s, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing: 3/18/14, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2250h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-29 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-0012h Motion Failed Div 120-216 |
2014-01-29 | House | Adopt Amendment #2250h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2250h for Jan 8 (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 4 |
2013-10-02 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-08-19 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/11/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-05-07 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/14/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==Including a Presentation on the Interlock Device== |
2013-04-16 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 4/25/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-04-16 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 4/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 2/21/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.197 |