NH HB496 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.931-933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.931-933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to radiological monitoring in nuclear emergency planning zones.
Title
Relative to radiological monitoring in nuclear emergency planning zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - RECOMMIT (REP R.READ) (Y: 76 N: 239 NV: 83 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.931-933 | |
2011-03-16 | House Recommit (R.Read): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 76-239; House Journal 28, PG.931-933 | |
2011-03-10 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 22, PG.565 | |
2011-03-10 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.565 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/10/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-02-22 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-02-15 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 10:35 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 11, PG. 188 |