NH HB494 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to industrial hemp as a controlled substance.
Title
Relative to industrial hemp as a controlled substance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 4/7/15, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 779 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 395-396 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 226 |