NH HB494 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the administration of glucagon injections for pupils.
Title
Relative to the administration of glucagon injections for pupils.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-08-30 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-08-30 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-04-30 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-03-07 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/21/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.197 |