NH HB494 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-11 - House Laid on Table (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Division Vote 182-168; House Journal 9, PG.535
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-11 - House Laid on Table (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Division Vote 182-168; House Journal 9, PG.535
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to tipped employees who deal card and table games at games of chance venues.
Title
Relative to tipped employees who deal card and table games at games of chance venues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-11 - House - OTP/AM 0111H (Y: 169 N: 180 NV: 21 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2012-01-11 - House - FLAM 0111H (REP INFANTINE) (Y: 225 N: 119 NV: 26 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2012-01-11 - House - FLAM 0111H (REP INFANTINE) (Y: 225 N: 119 NV: 26 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-11 | House Laid on Table (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Division Vote 182-168; House Journal 9, PG.535 | |
2012-01-11 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0111h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 169-180; House Journal 9, PG.533-535 | |
2012-01-11 | House Floor Amendment #2012-0111h (Rep Infantine) Adopted, Regular Calendar 225-119; House Journal 9, PG.530-533 | |
2011-10-21 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 70, PG.2223 | |
2011-10-21 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 4 (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2223 | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/18/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/4/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/21/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-09-12 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/20/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-06-01 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/8/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-03-01 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-02-10 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-02-09 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 11, PG. 188 |