NH HB493 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 196; Effective 7/6/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 196; Effective 7/6/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to minimum voting booths for city, town, school district, and village district elections.
Title
Relative to minimum voting booths for city, town, school district, and village district elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 196; Effective 7/6/2015 |
2015-06-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1227s (Rep Hoelzel): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1812 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1277s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1277s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1277s, New Title, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1277s, New Title, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/2/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-02-18 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 498 |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 18 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 238 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG. 226 |