NH HB492 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB492

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 20; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to electric personal assistive mobility devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to electric personal assistive mobility devices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 20; Eff. 1/1/2019
2018-04-19HouseEnrolled 04/19/2018
2018-04-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13
2018-04-05SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-14SenateHearing: 03/20/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 13
2018-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4
2018-01-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2430h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 45
2018-01-03HouseAmendment # 2017-2430h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 45
2017-10-26HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2430h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-10-11HouseExecutive Session: 10/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2017-09-14HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2017-08-24HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2017-08-16HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/24/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2017-05-09HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2017-03-01HouseRetained in Committee
2017-03-01HouseExecutive Session: 03/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 203
2017-01-31HousePublic Hearing: 02/22/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 15

Same As/Similar To

HB492 (Carry Over) 2017-10-26 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2430h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback